+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 11
February 13, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 4, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor