+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 13, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 8
February 16, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 14, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor