+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ read 3rd time
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 24, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 6, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor