+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ 3rd reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 26, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 6
February 22, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor