+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 5, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On December 24, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 14, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 10, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 20, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
January 25, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor