+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2016: House/ circled
March 3, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
March 3, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 29, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 5
February 17, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor