+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 7, 2012: Senate/ floor amendment
February 7, 2012: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2012: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor