+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On January 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor