+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute/ amended
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 7, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
January 27, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor