+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 4
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
March 5, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
February 25, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 25, 2021: Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 4
February 22, 2021: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 22, 2021: Senate/ circled
February 11, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2021: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor