+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Committee
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 13, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 3, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor