+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 14, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 10, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2010: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 3
February 24, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 7
February 3, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor