+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 20, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On December 30, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 19, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 18, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 20, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 3, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd (Suspension
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor