+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ circled
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Sen. Buttars, D. C.
Type:
Primary Sponsor