+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ lifted from standing committee
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2012: Senate/ floor amendment
March 5, 2012: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 29
March 5, 2012: Senate/ substituted
February 13, 2012: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor