+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 21, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 8, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Senate/ to House
On February 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 4, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 3
Passed
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2006: Senate/ concurs with House amendments
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 4
February 2, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 1, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor