+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (56)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law w/o Governor Signature
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 3 to # 5
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ to House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (12)
March 12, 2015: House/ substituted from # 3 to # 5
March 12, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
March 12, 2015: House/ uncircled
March 12, 2015: House/ circled
March 12, 2015: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2015: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 27, 2015: Senate/ uncircled
February 27, 2015: Senate/ circled
February 27, 2015: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2015: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 17, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor