+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
January 26, 2011: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor