+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/enacting clause struck
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Standing Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/received from LRGC
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor