+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 10
March 1, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2017: Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 21, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 1, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor