+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 24, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Vote
March 2, 2009: Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor