+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ suspension
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading/ returned to Rules
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (9)
March 12, 2013: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 12, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
March 5, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 5, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
March 4, 2013: Senate/ circled
March 4, 2013: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
February 20, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor