+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
- Senate/ received from House
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2021: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
February 17, 2021: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 6
February 8, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor