+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 25, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 19, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (5)
February 2, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
January 31, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
January 26, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 19, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor