+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (62)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ to Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ recalled by Senate
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- House/ recalled by House
- House/ motion to reconsider
- House/ circled
- House/ uncircled
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate Comm - Held
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (16)
March 6, 2017: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
March 2, 2017: House/ floor amendment # 1
March 2, 2017: House/ circled
March 2, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 4
March 2, 2017: House/ uncircled
March 2, 2017: House/ motion to reconsider
February 28, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2017: Senate/ uncircled
February 22, 2017: Senate/ circled
February 22, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2017: Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
February 2, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 2, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
January 30, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor