+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On January 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
January 21, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor