+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ filed
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ to Senate
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 5, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2017: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 17, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 31, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2017: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1