+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 30, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
January 20, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor