+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment # 4
- House/ floor amendment failed
- House/ floor amendment # 2
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
House Floor Amendment 4
Passed
House Floor Amendment 2
Passed
House Floor Amendment 3
Failed
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (10)
February 18, 2022: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 17, 2022: House/ floor amendment # 2
February 17, 2022: House/ floor amendment # 4
February 17, 2022: House/ floor amendment failed
February 17, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 16, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
February 4, 2022: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
January 25, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
January 25, 2022: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor