+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 17, 2006 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 5, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 22, 2006: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
February 21, 2006: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 23
- Absent: 6
February 13, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor