+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ to House
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute
On January 31, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 60
- Absent: 15
February 20, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2009: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 9, 2009: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2009: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor