+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Senate/ to House
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
February 22, 2016: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2016: Senate/ circled
February 17, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 12, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
February 9, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 3, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor