+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 16, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Governor
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ enrolled
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Rules Committee
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
- Senate/ pass 3rd
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ to standing committee
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 2nd
- Senate/ read 2nd
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 9
February 20, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor