+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Governor
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/signed by President/ enrolled
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 3rd Time
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Signed by Speaker sent Senate
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from House
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/read 3rd
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to House
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd
- Senate/under suspension of the rules
- Senate/committee report favorable
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/to Standing Committee
On January 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from LRGC
On January 15, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
February 19, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 8
February 4, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
January 31, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor