+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Rules Committee
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On February 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from Legislative Research
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendments (2)
House Amendment # 2
Prepared
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 19, 2004: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
February 10, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor