+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On March 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ concurs with House amendment
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received from Senate
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
February 28, 2020: Senate/ concurs with House amendment
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2020: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2020: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 24, 2020: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 18, 2020: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 14, 2020: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2020: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 10, 2020: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor