+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- Senate/ to Governor
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ to House
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ 2nd suspended
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate
- House/ to Senate
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
May 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 26
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor