+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ filed
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 9, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 29
February 8, 2021: Senate/ circled
February 8, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
February 1, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor