+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- House / Enacting Clause Struck
On March 3, 2003 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Comm
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- House Rules Comm to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
On February 20, 2003 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Comm
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 3rd Time
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Comm Report Favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Standing Committee
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
- House Received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor