+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ under suspension of the rules
- House/ read 2nd and 3rd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ lifted from Rules Comm
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 67
- Absent: 8
February 21, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor