+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On February 28, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ amended
- House/ uncircled
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- House/ circled
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st & 2nd (Under Suspension)
- House/ substituted by Rules Committee with amends
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 31, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 27, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 4
Passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 7
February 9, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor