+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 18, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ substituted/ amended
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 5, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor