+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 19, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On February 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 25, 2005 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm rpt fav/ amended/ placed on Consent
On January 24, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 20, 2005 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On January 17, 2005 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 10, 2005 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
February 16, 2005: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 8, 2005: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2005: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
January 24, 2005: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor