+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- House Sent to Lieutenant Governor
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
- House Signed by Speaker/Enrolled
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from Senate
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/signed by President to House
- Senate/pass 3rd
- Senate/read 3rd
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/pass 2nd
- Senate/read 2nd
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/from Rules Comm to 2nd
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 3rd Time
- House Received Fiscal Note from Fiscal
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/read 1st (Introduced)
On January 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Passed 3rd Reading
- House Sent to Senate
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate/received from House
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- House Read 2nd Time
- House Under Suspension of the Rules
- House Read 1st Time (Introduced)
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- House Received from General Counsel
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
January 27, 2003: Senate/pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 24, 2003: Senate/pass 2nd
- Yeas: 18
- Absent: 11
January 21, 2003: House Passed 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor