+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ received from Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- House/ to Senate
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2015: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2015: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 36
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2015: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 24, 2015: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor