+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ held
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (5)
February 3, 2022: House/ circled
February 3, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2022: House/ uncircled
January 31, 2022: House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor