+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ lifted from Rules
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
February 11, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 11, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 31, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor