+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ uncircled
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
March 5, 2013: House/ uncircled
March 4, 2013: House/ circled
March 4, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor