+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 9
February 24, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor