+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Lieutenant Governor
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (2)
February 24, 2009: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 17, 2009: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor